AFC DRONFIELD JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide the opportunity and facilities for young people to play association football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 06 January 2006: Standard registration
- AFC DRONFIELD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Louise Taylor | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Micheal Jones | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Gilberthorpe | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.73k | £30.50k | £50.08k | £48.92k | £68.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.99k | £34.56k | £50.39k | £54.87k | £58.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE DRONFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY AND FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
DRONFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BUCKINGHAM CLOSE
DRONFIELD WOODHOUSE
DRONFIELD
S18 8ZX
- Phone:
- 01246417482
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
afcdronfield.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window