AFRICAN FARMERS INTERNATIONAL TRAINING GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Building a library and a computer complex to assist the primary and Junior High schools in the Akan -Wawa district of Volta Region Ghana. Farmers who are the parents of the school pupils will use the facility during the holidays to learn about modern agricultural methods in order to increase food production for the farm families and to generate extra income for the family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ghana
Governance
- 14 December 2005: Standard registration
- 12 March 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- AFIT (Working name)
- AFITG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £550 | £1.10k | £850 | £200 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £529 | £950 | £500 | £200 | £450 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 08 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 08 November 2017 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 29 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 2 DECEMBER 2005 AND 14 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF FARMERS AND FARM FAMILIES FROM THE AFRICAN CONTINENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND AGRICULTURAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND SUCH CHARITABLE SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION CONSIDER APPROPRIATE, INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL TRAINING COURSES.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window