Trustees GREYLADYES ARTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Clifford Taylor Chair 30 January 2021
BURSLEDON VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Jennifer Ann Leeves Trustee 01 February 2025
THE MARGARET CROPPER TRUST
Received: On time
BURSLEDON & DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
John Dominic Burke Trustee 03 February 2024
None on record
Christopher Reginald Orton Trustee 25 July 2023
BURSLEDON VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
LIFE CHANGES COUNSELLING
Received: On time
MARTIN ANTHONY BRIDGER Trustee 25 July 2023
None on record
William Frederick Rodwell Trustee 30 January 2021
None on record
Stella Hockenhull Trustee 25 January 2020
None on record
Trevor George Stephen Clarke Trustee
None on record
MR J C WOOD Trustee
None on record