THE WALLPAPER HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising conferences, seminars and educational visits related to the history, development, manufacture and design of wallpapers and their preservation and conservation. Undertaking research and disseminating the useful results by means of a journal and online publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Banham | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Wendy Dallas Andrews | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Joy Brooke-Peat | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zoe Hendon | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ellis | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Birdsall | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Beighton-Dykes | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bush | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILLIPPA MAPES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.48k | £7.00k | £5.74k | £13.39k | £14.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.48k | £9.29k | £2.09k | £13.55k | £6.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED AT AN ANNUAL GENERAL MEETING DATED 16 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 6TH DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, DEVELOPMENT, MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN OF WALLCOVERINGS, MAINLY SINCE THE 16TH CENTURY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULT OF SUCH RESEARCH PARTICULARLY BY MEANS OF A JOURNAL AND ELECTRONIC MEANS WHERE POSSIBLE; \(B) SUPPORTING THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF HISTORIC AND CONTEMPORARY WALL COVERINGS ; (C) ORGANISING CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND OTHER SUCH EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Hillside View
Prenton
Wirral
Merseyside
CH43 2GG
- Phone:
- 07748549316
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window