Financial history HALTON HOUSING TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1111346
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £28.66m £31.52m £31.39m £33.04m £36.45m
Total expenditure £27.20m £25.63m £27.12m £28.79m £29.62m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.55m £3.07m £2.35m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £31.04m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £28.18m £30.85m £0 £32.66m £35.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.00k £193.00k £353.00k £378.00k £22.00k
Income - Other £465.00k £482.00k £0 £0 £1.11m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £27.13m £25.55m £27.12m £28.79m £29.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £63.79k £78.17k £0 £39.00k £31.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0