SUPPORTERS OF ISRAELS DEPENDANTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports any charitable purpose which has the object of improving the conditions of life and wellbeing of people living in Israel. This includes supporting projects that provide social and welfare support where needed to young adults who have no parents living with them in Israel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Israel
Governance
- 10 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL GEOFFREY GROSS | Chair |
|
||||||
MICHAEL BARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD IVAN SIMONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MILES LESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.08k | £11.00k | £19.34k | £39 | £355.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.00k | £26.27k | £2.94k | £4.38k | £332.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH HAS THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE LIVING IN ISRAEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ellerton House
10-12 Bryanston Square
London
W1H 2DQ
- Phone:
- 02077247434
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window