Financial history GAP MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1111373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.31k £60.14k £57.11k £79.34k £48.60k
Total expenditure £42.68k £37.85k £48.37k £87.55k £59.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A