NEW END SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association's objective is the advancing of the education of children attending New End Primary School, Hampstead, London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- 30 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Max Christodoulou | Chair | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thorarinn Freysson | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francisco Urzua Infante | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Eberhart | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Jane Biggs | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Scott | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Shariatmadari | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kimberley Foley | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALAN GIRLING | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
KARYN RAY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.49k | £107.90k | £79.30k | £130.32k | £158.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.44k | £62.75k | £69.04k | £140.83k | £186.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2020
(These accounts |
26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o New End Primary School
Streatley Place
London
NW3 1HU
- Phone:
- 07538881643
- Email:
- nesachair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window