BE THERE 4 U ADVICE LINE AND BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help alleviate the suffering and distress of people with disabilities, their families and carers by the provision of advice through a combined telephone, email, Home Visiting and web-based service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Sutton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 29 June 2006: Standard registration
- BE THERE 4 U (Previous name)
- THE MOBILITY ADVICE LINE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SKY TUDOR | Chair | 29 August 2006 |
|
|
||||
Marie Adams Mrs | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SHAKESPEARE | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | 01/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £58 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £28 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 09 March 2023 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 09 March 2023 | 646 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED ON 05 DEC 2017 as amended on 06 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO HELP ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE THROUGH A COMBINED TELEPHONE, EMAIL AND WEB-BASED SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manningford Hall
Bells Lane
Druids Heath
Birmingham
B14 5RY
- Phone:
- 07599 475067
- Email:
- enquiries@bt4u.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window