WARWICKSHIRE CRICKET CLUB FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WCCVI is a Cricket Club specifically set up for visually impaired people to take part in the cricket league and Bill Frindell Memorial Trophy, ran under BCEW (Blind Cricket England & Wales) a charity wich governs sports in England & wales. Also to take part in the Knock Out Cup that is mainly if not totally funded by The Primary Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 31 March 2006: Standard registration
- WARWICKSHIRE CCVI (Working name)
- WCCVI (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER SUGG | Chair |
|
||||||
BEVERLEY HOLLINGSWORTH | Trustee | 26 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARK TURNHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NATHAN FOY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | £6.95k | £5.27k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.28k | £4.88k | £2.02k | £15 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 423 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED AT AN EXTRAORDINARY GENERAL MEETING DATED 17 DECEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION WITHIN WARWICKSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR AMONG VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET.
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 GRANGE COTTAGES
SNOWFORD HILL
LEAMINGTON ROAD
LONG ITCHINGTON
SOUTHAM
CV47 9QE
- Phone:
- 07773095170
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window