THE DEEPING MEN'S GROUP CHARITIES FUND LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides on loan equipment to assist people with disability, in our local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 19 September 2005: Standard registration
- 27 May 2021: Funds received from 1034615 DEEPING ST. JAMES AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SHOW S...
- THE DEEPING MEN'S GROUP CHARITIES FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BRIAN THORNTHWAITE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Dorward | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Elizabeth Roberts | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Warren | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stewart Yates | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Young | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Brown | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.40k | £11.20k | £12.17k | £19.72k | £16.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.17k | £13.12k | £11.64k | £15.75k | £14.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
3.1. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE SICK OR DISABLED, IN PARTICULAR THOSE PERSONS IN THE AREA GENERALLY COVERED BY THE DEEPING HEALTH CENTRE, BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT SUCH AS WHEELCHAIRS AND OTHER MEDICAL AIDS, NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY 3.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE AREA GENERALLY COVERED BY THE DEEPING HEALTH CENTRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deeping Men's Group Charities Ltd.
38 Church Street
Deeping St. James
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 8HD
- Phone:
- 07902510471
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window