THE CURE PARKINSON'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cure Parkinson's Trust's purpose is to fund research to hasten a cure for this debilitative neurological condition. The charity's primary role is identifying, funding and evaluating research projects, as well as hosting scientific forums to bring relevant scientists within the field together, to discuss key areas of research and technology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£9,379,079
Donations and legacies | £8.13m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £970.73k | |
Investments | £275.12k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,771,048
Raising funds | £1.22m | |
Charitable activities | £6.55m | |
Other | £0 |
£539,864 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £83,770 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.22m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.55m | |
Retained for future use | £1.61m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.22m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.55m | |
Retained for future use | £2.15m |
People

31 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 October 2005: Standard registration
- CURE PARKINSON'S (Working name)
- Cure Parkinson's (Working name)
- MOVERS AND SHAKERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Ashton | Chair | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hodges | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Stamford-Moroz | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Llewellyn | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Anderson | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Feighery | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Fitzgerald | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TYNDALL | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNDSEY ISAACS | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Ashford Jones | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Anne Rock | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Fletcher | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.92m | £2.45m | £2.45m | £4.59m | £9.38m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.44m | £2.02m | £2.76m | £3.53m | £7.77m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £63.22k | £25.38k | £373.08k | £83.77k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.35m | £1.98m | £2.24m | £3.60m | £8.13m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £558.27k | £467.28k | £202.42k | £967.71k | £970.73k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.46k | £2.97k | £3.74k | £21.77k | £275.12k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £208.55k | £84.52k | £209.70k | £444.63k | £418.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.97m | £1.33m | £2.13m | £2.38m | £6.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £473.01k | £682.03k | £630.20k | £1.14m | £1.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £220.56k | £160.16k | £158.41k | £273.03k | £174.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £898.18k | £498.51k | £1.38m | £851.91k | £5.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £7.16k | £17.72k | £19.73k | £25.66k | £31.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £33.27k | £24.34k | £29.35k | £24.91k | £13.54k | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.13m | £2.36m | £2.72m | £3.54m | £3.99m | |
|
Other assets | £3.17m | £3.53m | £3.95m | £7.14m | £10.23m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.08m | £1.98m | £2.70m | £5.80m | £7.18m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 AUGUST 2005, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 19 JUNE 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JUN 2009 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 APR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PARKINSON'S DISEASE BY THE FACILITATION AND PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, TREATMENT AND CURE OF THE DISEASE; BY THE INVOLVEMENT IN SUCH RESEARCH OF PEOPLE WITH PARKINSON’S AND BY THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS THEREOF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO SUCH BODIES AND RESEARCH INSTITUTIONS ASSOCIATED WITH PARKINSON'S DISEASE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC OF PARKINSON'S DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cure Parkinsons Trust
120 New Cavendish Street
LONDON
W1W 6XX
- Phone:
- 02079297656
- Email:
- david@cureparkinsons.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window