GLOBAL DISASTER RELIEF FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Principal activity of the Charity is that of providing funds for disaster relief worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 October 2005: Standard registration
- GDRF (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
atul sharma | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN JOHN WESTNEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 29/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.45k | £25.83k | £1.54k | £685 | £686 | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.68k | £24.74k | £784 | £193 | £194 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 July 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2021 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16TH AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11TH OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES AFFECTED BY NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS OR ACTS OF TERRORISM ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, CREED OR COLOUR.
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chiswick Gate
598-608 Chiswick High Road
Chiswick
London
w4 5rt
- Phone:
- 02089983456
- Email:
- atul@gkpp.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window