VEDIC ASHRAM TRUST : CARE (V:CARE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administration support to sister charity set up in India which provides social and healthcare services to local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 11 November 2005: Standard registration
- V:CARE (Working name)
- VEDIC ASHRAM TRUST:CARE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDEEP MOHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SATNAM SINGH SAHOTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MELANIE MAHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 9 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND INDIA, AMONG PERSONS SUFFERING OR AT RISK FROM CANCER, HIV/AIDS AND/OR MOTOR NEURONE DISEASES IN GENERAL, BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF CENTRES FOR PALLIATIVE CARE AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN MEETING THE COSTS OF TREATMENT AT RECOGNISED CENTRES. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND IN INDIA, IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER, HIV/AIDS AND/OR MOTOR NEURONE DISEASES IN GENERAL AND THE NEEDS OF THOSE AFFECTED BY SUCH CONDITIONS, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO THE PUBLIC, LOCAL/NATIONAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY BODIES AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS OR BY SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UK AND INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 SLOUGH ROAD
DATCHET
SLOUGH
SL3 9AG
- Phone:
- 07837609361
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window