THE BRICK LANE JAMME MASJID TRUST (LONDON) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Islamic faith. To faciliate the performance of prayers, Eid congregations, special prayer, Islamic conferences, seminars and running school for Islamic education. General education for Muslim children and youths.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 05 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nure Alom Russell | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nurul Islam | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suba Miah | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angur Ali | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Khalik | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Moshiur Rahman Choudhury | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Syed Khairul Islam | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Hafijur Rahman | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Arfik Ali | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ansarul Haque | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALTAFUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMIR HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ABDUL MUSABBIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ILIYAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YOUSUF KAMALY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAYLAL UDDIN ALI | Trustee |
|
||||||
HAMIDUR RAHMAN CHOUDHURY | Trustee |
|
||||||
SYED MORTUZA ALI | Trustee |
|
||||||
ABDUL GOFUR KHALISADAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOTIUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARMUZ ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED NURUL HOQUE LALA MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NUR UDDIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.29k | £178.46k | £229.18k | £248.16k | £176.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.58k | £185.78k | £141.35k | £199.97k | £133.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.10k | £7.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE PROMOTION OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE PROMOTION OF THE TEACHING OF THE AHL-E-SUNNATH WAL JAMATH IN THE AREA OF THE GREATER LONDON AUTHORITY. TO MAINTAIN & MANAGE THE AFFAIRS OF THE FREEHOLD PROPERTY AT 59 BRICK LANE, LONDON E1. TO FACILITATE PERFORMANCE OF PRAYER FIVE TIMES A DAY, HOLDING OF TWO EID CONGREGATIONS, SPECIAL PRAYERS, ISLAMIC CONFERENCES, SEMINARS, MEETINGS, LECTURES AND RUNNING SCHOOL FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION. ALONG WITH GENERAL EDUCATION FOR MUSLIM CHILDREN & YOUTHS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 BRICK LANE
LONDON
E1 6QL
- Phone:
- 02072476052
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window