Financial history THE ISLE OF WIGHT RED SQUIRREL TRUST

Charity number: 1112374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.19k £73.58k £14.32k £43.71k £82.01k
Total expenditure £13.44k £14.39k £13.34k £10.51k £12.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A