SUPPORTING TANZANIAN ORPHANS AND WIDOWS (STOW)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with a Tanzanian NGO called TUMAINI, based in Tanga. We provide funds to support orphans to go to school and in Further Education; and small loans to their carers to help with small income-generating operations. We raise money by subscriptions, donations, sponsorships and fundraising events. Twice a year, we visit the schools, colleges and homes with the NGO to see the children and carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tanzania
Governance
- 06 December 2005: Standard registration
- STOW (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIE JEANNETTE ADAMS | Chair | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
Donald McGregor | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN STEVENS | Trustee | 07 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
LINDY POTTER | Trustee | 07 September 2008 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN POTTER | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE WILLSCRISP | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HENRY IAN WILLS CRISP | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Adams | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.54k | £94.56k | £47.02k | £49.54k | £53.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.45k | £48.95k | £60.60k | £62.21k | £56.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2013
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG CHILDREN IN TANZANIA AND OTHER AFRICAN COUNTRIES WHO HAVE LOST ONE OR BOTH PARENTS THROUGH AIDS AND AMONG WOMEN WIDOWED AS A RESULT OF AIDS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND SUCH FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN IN TANZANIA AND OTHER AFRICAN COUNTRIES WHO HAVE LOST ONE OR BOTH PARENTS THROUGH AIDS BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
TANZANIA AND OTHER AFRICAN COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACORN COTTAGE
MAIN ROAD
KELSALE
SAXMUNDHAM
IP17 2QY
- Phone:
- 01728603348
- Email:
- info@stowcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window