Accounts and annual returns BERMUDA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1112068
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 April 2025 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 November 2024 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window