Financial history BERMUDA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1112068
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £144.93k £21.82k £11.77k £14.69k £18.55k
Total expenditure £145.46k £17.99k £13.69k £13.16k £17.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £127.57k £13.10k N/A N/A N/A