COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR SURREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Foundation for Surrey is an independent charitable trust dedicated to inspiring local giving, providing philanthropy advice and building permanent community funds to improve the lives of people in Surrey. The Foundation awards grants throughout Surrey to support local community and voluntary groups who make a real difference to the quality of life in their communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,421,000
Donations and legacies | £1.82m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £602.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,553,000
Raising funds | £132.00k | |
Charitable activities | £2.42m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,318,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £132.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.42m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £132.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.42m | |
Retained for future use | £1.19m |
People

11 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
216 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 October 2005: Standard registration
- 17 October 2014: Funds received from 1001829 THE THOMAS TRUST
- 21 August 2015: Funds received from 237970 LADY NOEL BYRON'S NURSING CHARITY (EAST AND WEST H...
- 27 October 2015: Funds received from 1078266 THE BETTY PARR WHITBREAD MUSIC TRUST
- 23 March 2017: Funds received from 240939 THE FOLEY CHARITY
- 11 May 2017: Funds received from 312023 THE UNWIN AWARD (L C W WOKING HIGHLANDS COUNTY SEC...
- 11 May 2017: Funds received from 312020 ALFRED AND BEATRICE LANE FUND ICW HIGHLANDS SEC SC...
- 15 May 2017: Funds received from 312111-1 JEAN WHITING PRIZE FUND ICW DORKING COUNTY SCHOOL
- 15 May 2017: Funds received from 312111-3 THE DYSON MEMORIAL PRIZE FOR MUSICIANSHIP ICW DORK...
- 15 May 2017: Funds received from 312111-2 THE CHARLES GOFFIN MEMORIAL FUND ICW DORKING COUNT...
- 26 November 2018: Funds received from 312118 CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE SURB...
- 26 November 2018: Funds received from 312111 CHARITIES ADMINISTERED ICW DORKING COUNTY SCHOOL
- SCF (Previous name)
- SURREY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neelam Devesher DL | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Tamalie Newbery | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Sanderson | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roshan Bailey | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Stead | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruchika Gupta | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Diana Bridget Whittington | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Martin Brooks | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Edwin Downes | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Cluff | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.86m | £4.41m | £3.29m | £2.37m | £2.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.33m | £4.85m | £3.07m | £2.87m | £2.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £208.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.43m | £3.89m | £2.87m | £5.30m | £1.82m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £226.60k | £193.23k | £624.86k | £2.93m | £148.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £416.80k | £371.44k | £424.82k | £528.00k | £602.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £342.76k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.19m | £4.72m | £2.95m | £2.70m | £2.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £136.13k | £126.33k | £125.60k | £172.00k | £132.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.08k | £12.66k | £23.36k | £33.00k | £35.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.81m | £4.25m | £2.55m | £2.28m | £2.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £38.40k | £34.82k | £38.31k | £42.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.38k | £4.38k | £4.74k | £9.00k | £19.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.46m | £13.81m | £14.86m | £16.69m | £17.61m | |
|
Other assets | £1.70m | £1.30m | £1.39m | £1.14m | £1.38m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £72.74k | £77.68k | £132.85k | £126.00k | £107.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/12/2011 as amended on 10 Feb 2021 as amended on 02 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
4. The Charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following: (1) the promotion of any charitable purposes for the benefit of the community in the County of Surrey and in particular the advancement of education, the protection of good health both mental and physical and the relief of poverty and sickness; (2) other exclusively charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and elsewhere which are in the opinion of the Trustees beneficial to the community including those in the area of benefit.
Area of benefit
SURREY, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Floor Export House
5 Henry Plaza
Victoria Way
Woking
GU21 6QX
- Phone:
- 01483478092
- Email:
- info@cfsurrey.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window