SOZO MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to bring Wholeness to the world through Jesus Christ by being available to help anyone with advice from the Holy Bible for all problems of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 12 October 2005: Standard registration
- SOZO MINISTRIES INTL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARION RHODA DANIEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Simon Anthony Badger | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Spencer Daniel | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HENRY WAYLEN CARY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RHONDA ANN SHERLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL SULLIVAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.70k | £297.36k | £254.67k | £254.11k | £289.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £264.35k | £225.72k | £239.95k | £256.69k | £266.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY BY PROCLAIMING AND FURTHERING THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE UNCOMPROMISED WORD OF GOD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PLACE OR PLACES AS SHALL BE DECIDED UPON BY THE TRUSTEES CONSISTENTLY WITH THE DOCTRINE OF ARTICLES AND BELIEF SET OUT IN CLAUSE 10 OF THIS MEMORANDUM 3.1.2 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK 3.1.3 TO PROMOTE OR PROVIDE EDUCATION (INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING) 3.1.4 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sozo Ministries International
Dunwood Oaks
Danes Road
Awbridge
ROMSEY
SO51 0GF
- Phone:
- 01794344920
- Email:
- email@sozo.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window