HELP INDIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help support disadvantaged children & young people in India either in kind/with direct financial aid or through other projects/charities supporting such people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 17 October 2005: Standard registration
- HI (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT WILLIAM ADAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN JOHN PRICE | Trustee |
|
||||||
HILARY LOIS LIDDLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £838 | £869 | £856 | £856 | £856 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 February 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") IN INDIA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"): (I) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN INDIA BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS OR SERVICES OR FACILITIES INCLUDING PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHICH GIVE HELP TO DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOLING AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING TO ENABLE THEM TO BECOME INDEPENDENT AND PRODUCTIVE; (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE KNOWLEDGE OF WORKING WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF PROJECTS WHICH DEVELOP THE SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THOSE WORKING FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN OR YOUNG PEOPLE OR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS.
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 LANSDOWN DRIVE
RETFORD
DN22 7WY
- Phone:
- 01777701073
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window