BEDFORD MAYOR'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist cultural activities in Bedford and also charitable institutions in the United Kingdom as the Mayor may from time to time appoint
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
Governance
- 06 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Andrea Spice | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Councillor Sarah-Jayne Gallagher | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Councillor Jim Weir | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.79k | £20 | £720 | £726 | £226 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.95k | £3.00k | £1.50k | £1.50k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: (A) TO DEVELOP AND IMPROVE THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND (B) PRACTICE OF THE ARTS AND MUSIC IN THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF BEDFORD IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING FACILITATING EVENTS AND THE GIVING OF DONATIONS AND GRANTS TO VOLUNTARY AND OTHER NOT-FOR-PROFIT GROUPS WHO CARRY OUT THIS FUNCTION; TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE MAYOR MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY WRITING APPOINT
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF BEDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEDFORD BOROUGH COUNCIL
BOROUGH HALL
CAULDWELL STREET
BEDFORD
MK42 9AP
- Phone:
- 01234 718204
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window