THE ROWAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide grants to achieve our charitable objects. We do not respond to unsolicited requests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 October 2007: Standard registration
- 22 February 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.16k | £5.98k | £4.82k | £21.48k | £2.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.67k | £35.87k | £64.27k | £104.92k | £100.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT BIRMINGHAM PROBATE REGISTRY ON 2 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 5 JULY 2005 AND COURT ORDER DATED SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
EXCLUSIVELY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES ("THE ROWAN TRUST") AND APPLIED FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 1 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC - THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC RESOURCES AND SERVICES TO MEET NEEDS ARISING IN ANY COMMUNITY, WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE WHERE THE RELIEF OF SUCH NEEDS IS CHARITABLE BY REASON OF THE RELIEVING AND/OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY OR SICKNESS OF FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. 2 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC - THE PROVISION FOR THE COMMUNITY WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE OF THE BASIC RESOURCES AND SERVICES COMPRISING CHARITABLE PUBLIC UTILITIES. 3 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC - THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, BEING DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT GENERATION WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS BY: 3A THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; 3B THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; 3C THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT; AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS, PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. 4 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC - THE PROMOTION OF THE CULTURAL ARTS AND THE MEANS WHEREBY INDIVIDUALS CAN HAVE ACCESS TO THE CULTURAL ARTS. 5 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC - TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS ANY OR ALL OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, THE COMMUNITY SHALL BE A BODY OF PEOPLE ORGANISED INTO A POLITICAL MUNICIPAL OR SOCIAL UNITY OR PERSONS LIVING IN THE SAME LOCALITY; AND ANY COMMUNITY SHALL BE CONSTRUED ACCORDINGLY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window