SHOFAR CHRISTIAN CHURCH LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shofar Christian Church seeks to advance the Christian faith in the UK, to advance education in accordance with Christian principles and to relieve persons who are in conditions of need or hardship. Shofar also partners with and supports churches and charities abroad, including Europe, Asia and Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 October 2005: Standard registration
- 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1155031 MERTON VINEYARD CHURCH
- SHOFAR CHRISTIAN CHURCH (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaun Michael Stober | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Bain | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heinrich Matthew Titus | Trustee | 03 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.14k | £121.91k | £81.38k | £73.17k | £73.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.33k | £119.69k | £69.58k | £76.62k | £76.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2024 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2024 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 APRIL 2009 as amended on 13 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS OF THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF CHRISTIAN CHURCHES. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES INCLUDING MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ONE OR MORE INSTITUTIONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF CHRISTIAN TEACHING AND TRAINING IN CHRISTIAN MINISTRY. (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
120 Busbridge Lane
GODALMING
Surrey
GU7 1QJ
- Phone:
- 02085404000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window