THE SARAH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support relief and development projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Pakistan
Governance
- 02 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr BENEDICT RICHARDS BSc PhD | Trustee | 18 July 2005 |
|
|
||||||
ZAFAR PERVEZ FRANCIS MA, PGDIP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROSEMARY ANNE JAMES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
STEPHEN SMITH MA PGDIP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DR BEN RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.70k | £2.53k | £420 | £525 | £525 | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.67k | £10.78k | £16.83k | £2.06k | £669 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 10 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY IN PRACTICE IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PAKISTAN AND ZAMBIA, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE, INCLUDING SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES, THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL UNIFORMS, MEDICAL AND OTHER DISASTER RELIEF. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, IN PRACTICE IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PAKISTAN AND ZAMBIA BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL BOOKS AND OTHER NECESSARY EQUIPMENT, TRAINERS AND SUCH FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE. 3. THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY IN PRACTICE IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PAKISTAN AND ZAMBIA BY THE PROVISION OF OR ACCESS TO IMMUNISATION PROGRAMMES, VACCINES, ACCESS TO CLEAN WATER AND THE PROVISION OF SANITATION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 MYRDLE STREET
LONDON
E1 1EU
- Phone:
- 07939596186
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window