WALTHAM FOREST ACCESS ALLIANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monitoring and advising on disability access in the London Borough of Waltham Forest
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 05 January 2006: Standard registration
- 12 August 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WFAA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33k | £0 | £2.12k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.91k | £5.53k | £3.68k | £1.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 21 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 21 July 2010 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 28 July 2009 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 05 June 2008 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 30 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED 8 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY UNDERTAKING AUDITS ON ACCESSIBILITY AND PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION FOR SUCH PEOPLE
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FORREST AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window