Accounts and annual returns THE THOMAS LESLIE TIBBETTS GIFT

Charity Number: 1112733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 February 2024 03 January 2025 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 24 February 2023 30 July 2024 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 24 February 2022 30 July 2024 584 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 24 February 2021 30 July 2024 949 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 24 February 2020 30 July 2024 1314 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 February 2020 Not Required