FRIENDS OF SAINT CECILIA'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1)Organising a number of fundraising events with the dual purpose of developing relationships between staff and parents and raising funds to provide: (2)Donations to the school to enable certain activities to take place and for the purchase of equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 03 October 2005: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF SAINT CECILIAS (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF SAINT CECILIAS WANDSWORTH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Sarah Shaw | Chair | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Martin Drage | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotta Trygg Bolton | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chavionne Richardson-Walker | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Gregg | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.01k | £9.43k | £8.00k | £11.86k | £15.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.91k | £28.91k | £3.85k | £20.05k | £13.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 OCT 2019 as amended on 20 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. CECILIA'S C OF E SCHOOL
SUTHERLAND GROVE
LONDON
SW18 5JR
- Phone:
- 07504295732
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window