THE CAMBRIDGE CHINA DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports education and research in the field of economics, business studies, systems of governance and the development of leadership, managerial and business skills. The charity's principal activity is the annual China Executive Leadership Programme which brings together the leaders of Chinese business and the chief executive officers of global companies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- China
Governance
- 10 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD BROERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Vuk JEREMIC | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Patrizio BIANCHI | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Simon REDFERN | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
NICK BUTLER | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR PETER LITTLEWOOD | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR KJELD ERIK BRODSGAARD | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DOUGLAS FLINT | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL LANDESMANN | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON HENRY | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT WILKINSON | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr SIMON DEAKIN | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||||
SIR MARK MOODY-STUART | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
MUHTAR KENT | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SIR JOHN PARKER FREng | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Peter Hugh Nolan | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ANIL SEAL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR R B HEAP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RAYMOND PING LUEN KWOK JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.15k | £97 | £190.37k | £278.39k | £487.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.22k | £166.54k | £134.64k | £149.03k | £691.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION DATED 9 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR ANY BRANCHES OR ASPECTS OF EDUCATION LIKELY TO BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF EITHER BRITISH SUBJECTS ON THE ONE HAND OR CITIZENS OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA ON THE OTHER, OR BOTH, IN THE FIELDS OF ECONOMICS, BUSINESS STUDIES, SYSTEMS OF GOVERNANCE AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF LEADERSHIP MANAGERIAL AND BUSINESS SKILLS, AND IN PARTICULAR BY (A) PUTTING ON COURSES SEMINARS TRAINING PROGRAMMES AND LECTURES AT CAMBRIDGE AND ELSEWHERE (B) THE PROVISION OF VISITING FELLOWSHIPS, SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES AND SECONDMENTS FOR STUDY AT CAMBRIDGE, ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN THE EUROPEAN UNION AND IN THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA.
Area of benefit
CHINA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1TQ
- Phone:
- 01223748738
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window