Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF HENRY CHICHELE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1111563
Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 29 April 2025 699 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 June 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 July 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 July 2021 397 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required