THE FRIENDS OF HENRY CHICHELE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1111563
Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO FUNDRAISE IN ORDER TO PROVIDE & ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES & EQUIPMENT AT THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LEA.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022

Total income: £6,036
Total expenditure: £4,517

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HENRY'S FRIENDS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ebony Tobin Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £6.90k £10.49k £3.28k £1.80k £6.04k
Total expenditure £3.43k £12.79k £5.64k £7.97k £4.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 29 April 2025 699 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 June 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 July 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 July 2021 397 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HENRY CHICHELE PRIMARY SCHOOL
SCHOOL LANE
HIGHAM FERRERS
RUSHDEN
NN10 8NQ
Phone:
01933352850
Website:

No information available