THE FRANCIS JACKSON CHORAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, improve, develop and maintain education in and the appreciation of the art and science of choral music in all its aspects andparticularly but not exclusively to provide financial support for the general and musical education of choristers including the cost of providing training, scholarships, music, and instruments at both York Minster and Minster School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of York
Governance
- 31 January 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL BACKHOUSE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev John Michael Roden | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger James Boulton | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEWART MICHAEL PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.06k | £2.77k | £3.17k | £13.29k | £9.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.72k | £2.63k | £3.00k | £35 | £67 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 August 2024 | 474 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 January 2022 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 19 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN EDUCATION IN AND THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR THE GENERAL AND MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHORISTERS INCLUDING THE COST OF PROVIDING TRAINING, SCHOLARSHIPS, MUSIC AND INSTRUMENTS AT BOTH YORK MINSTER AND MINSTER SCHOOL AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DEEM NECESSARY
Area of benefit
YORK MINSTER AND MINSTER SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 CLIFTON GREEN
YORK
YO30 6LN
- Phone:
- 01904653230
- Email:
- michael_backhouse@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window