KALEIDOSCOPE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kaleidescope is an internationally recognised drugs service providing treatment and testing to clients on its own sites. The project is a passionate advocate of the rights of drug users to receive quality services in an hospitable environment. It aims to promote social inclusion and makes innovative contributions to the well being of the whole community. Respect and hospitality are the cornerstone
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£18,669,817
Donations and legacies | £230.03k | |
Charitable activities | £18.21m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £232.96k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£17,951,293
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £17.95m | |
Other | £0 |
-£39,374 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £16,856,059 from 10 government contract(s) and £226,513 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £17.95m | |
Retained for future use | £718.52k |
People

271 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
118 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wirral
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 30 June 2006: Standard registration
- KALEIDOSCOPE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Leo Antebi | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lewis | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Vickery | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Harding-Brown | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Blackwood Charlton | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kasim Ali | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alan Tudor | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Procter | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Ross | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julian Mark Quentin Knight | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Marie Pepinster | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.89m | £10.21m | £11.04m | £12.71m | £18.67m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.94m | £10.11m | £10.57m | £12.63m | £17.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.28m | £8.28m | £10.44m | £10.80m | £16.86m | |
|
Income from government grants | £191.18k | N/A | £240.38k | £325.47k | £226.51k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £192.27k | £49.78k | £1.33k | £326.81k | £230.03k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £83.04k | £124.04k | £194.66k | £52.18k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.28m | £9.79m | £10.44m | £12.15m | £18.21m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £266.02k | £240.22k | £172.53k | £182.36k | £232.96k | |
|
Income - Other | £67.68k | £6.03k | £240.38k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.87m | £10.07m | £10.45m | £12.63m | £17.95m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £51.62k | £46.74k | £120.17k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.50k | £2.50k | £2.40k | £78.69k | £68.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £19.75k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.44m | £3.90m | £1.30m | £3.68m | £4.01m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.50m | £0 | £2.54m | £2.54m | £2.58m | |
|
Other assets | £4.07m | £6.21m | £7.05m | £6.42m | £7.99m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£101.00k | -£152.00k | -£93.67k | -£61.67k | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.36m | £5.27m | £4.95m | £6.68m | £4.99m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 APRIL 2006. as amended on 09 Oct 2024 as amended on 05 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
3.0 The Charity’s objects (the Objects) are: 3.1. The relief of need of people who are suffering due to substance abuse, mental health challenges, experience of the criminal justice system or physical or mental hardship or distress by the provision of a holistic care and support, in particular but not exclusively through: 3.1.1. The provision of medical clinics and other facilities for the prevention or treatment of physical problems associated with substance misuse, , physical and mental ill health and challenges resulting from experience of the criminal justice system; 3.1.2. The provision of residential care or other facilities for people facing difficulties due to substance use, physical and mental health and the criminal justice system 3.1.3 The provision of facilities and opportunities for the development of skills and interests linked to recovery, 3.2. to advance the education of the wider community regarding substance misuse, physical and mental health, experience of the criminal justice system and challenging stigma 3.3. to advance education for the public benefit in issues related to substance use; mental health and the criminal justice system. 3.4. to provide or assist in the provision of facilities or social enterprises in the interest of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their substance use, physical or mental health or experience of the criminal justice system with the object of improving their conditions of life; 3.5. to advance such other charitable purposes as the Trustees shall from time to time determine.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Resolven House
St Mellons Business Park
Fortran Road
St Mellons
CF3 0EY
- Phone:
- 01633811950
- Email:
- info@kaleidoscope68.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window