ST MARY'S EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising of funds to support the ongoing costs of the boarding accomodation for children attending the school, the existing school to meet the educational costs of the children attending. Supporting the building of a secondary school/college for the further education of the pupils and villagers, and supporting of land purchased for providing food in the form of rice grown on the land.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- India
Governance
- 27 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FATHER DOMINIC SAVIO CHUKKA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Father Mario | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Charles Callow | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Quinn | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Banerjee | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bonita Rennie | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev GERARDO FABRIZIO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.33k | £78.88k | £67.67k | £105.26k | £100.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.26k | £43.01k | £66.66k | £82.42k | £156.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 23 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
I) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHETHER OR NOT THEY ARE RESIDENT OR TEMPORARILY LOCATED IN THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES II) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND EMPLOYABILITY THROUGH THE ACQUISITION OF SKILLS THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. IN RESPECT OF THESE OBJECTS NO REGARD OR HINDRANCE TO THE CHARITABLE WORK UNDERTAKEN WILL BE MADE IN RESPECT OF RELIGION CAST OR CREED.
Area of benefit
REPUBLIC OF INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Redhouse Road
Tettenhall
Wolverhampton
West Midlands
WV6 8SU
- Phone:
- 07305445484
- Email:
- enquiries@stmarystrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window