Trustees ST MARY'S EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1113945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FATHER DOMINIC SAVIO CHUKKA Chair
None on record
Father Mario Trustee 25 September 2018
None on record
Daniel Charles Callow Trustee 11 October 2017
None on record
Maggie Quinn Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Kathryn Banerjee Trustee 13 March 2015
None on record
Bonita Rennie Trustee 11 December 2013
None on record
Rev GERARDO FABRIZIO Trustee
None on record