Accounts and annual returns MWANJATI VILLAGE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1111695
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 06 February 2025 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 06 February 2025 732 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 November 2022 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 April 2021 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required