GRACE CHURCH DULWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Southwark
Governance
- 19 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip Christopher Martin | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Christine Burke | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marcus David Evans | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Warren James Nettleford | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NEDEN | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Jones | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.62k | £267.80k | £397.25k | £305.57k | £397.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.62k | £227.69k | £284.62k | £346.05k | £305.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRIST'S KINGDOM BY THE FAITHFUL TEACHING OF THE SCRIPTURES AT GRACE CHURCH DULWICH AND BY THE RECRUITMENT EDUCATION TRAINING AND SENDING OF GOSPEL MINISTERS AND OTHERS AROUND THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD TO ESTABLISH AND RENEW CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND MINISTRIES RELATED THERETO 3.2 THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS AMONG ANY PERSONS WITHOUT LIMITATION. 3.3 THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANS WHO ARE PERSECUTED BY REASON OF THEIR FAITH PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH SUPPORT SHALL BE NON-POLITICAL IN NATURE 3.4 THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANS WHO ARE ENGAGED FULL-TIME IN THE MISSIONARY WORK OF PROCLAIMING THE GOSPEL AND IN BRINGING OTHERS TO BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST AND TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH HIS TEACHING "THE CHRISTIAN FAITH" IS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 12.1 OF THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
DULWICH, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
135 SYDENHAM PARK ROAD
LONDON
SE26 4LP
- Phone:
- 07500685209
- Email:
- admin@gracechurchdulwich.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window