THE DAVID AND HELEN LOWE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides charitable funding to organisations that will benefit the inhabitants of Malvern and the surrounding districts as the trustees may select.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 21 October 2005: Standard registration
- DAVID AND HELEN LOWE CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lily Lowe | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELIZABETH LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN FAWBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £0 | £12.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.50k | £15.00k | £12.41k | £8.50k | £11.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH WILL BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF MALVERN AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY SELECT.
Area of benefit
MALVERN AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cherry Orchard
Threadneedle Street
Bergh Apton
NORWICH
NR15 1BJ
- Phone:
- 07855527501
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window