FRUITFUL GOSPEL TABERNACLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
? To advance Christianity throughout the whole of the United Kingdom and to teach the uncompromising word of God to its members and the general public at large. ? Promoting & developing talent within local community ? Supporting the less privilege within the church and the local community ? Connecting all people from various local communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 February 2006: Standard registration
- FGM (Working name)
- FRUITFUL GOSPEL MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Enivwenae | Chair | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Gladys Osunde | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
CECILIA OSEI-WUSO | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR CLEVY GBEGBAJE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR DON REX O | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.38k | £6.00k | £6.76k | £6.75k | £5.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.32k | £4.48k | £8.16k | £4.95k | £2.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 254 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 254 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 620 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 620 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 March 2022 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2015
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED ARISING FROM POVERTY, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR AS A RESULT OF NATURAL DISASTER BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL ASSISTANCE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
198 Selhurst Road
LONDON
SE25 6XU
- Phone:
- 02086908519
- Email:
- fruitfulgt@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window