THE RAZUMOVSKY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Presentation of concerts and masterclasses, sponsoring ecceptionally gifted young musicians
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR BERNARD ANTHONY RIX | Chair | 03 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Richard John Pearson Aikens | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||
SARA STEWART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY BARRACLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.93k | £17.19k | £116.99k | £52.00k | £156.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.24k | £49.08k | £28.15k | £32.88k | £80.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2021 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2021 | 363 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IMPROVE PROMOTE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ASPECTS AND SPECIFICALLY BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THE MUSIC OF THE RAZUMOVSKY ENSEMBLE BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC EVENTS AND BY SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ALL ART FORMS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE INVOLVING MUSIC INCLUDING OTHER CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN ORDER TO MAKE THESE MORE ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; TO BENEFIT ANY CHARITY AND TO FURTHER ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 ASHBURNHAM ROAD
LONDON
NW10 5SD
- Phone:
- 02089695031
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window