EPILEPSYSUSSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to educate people about epilepsy, we offer support and advice for individuals and their family's. We provide awareness and training. We provide hospital volunteers who are based in the local hospitals and they provide support and information. We raise funds to enable us to continue to provide up to date information and to man a helpline. We support anyone no matter the circumstances
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 March 2006: Standard registration
- EAEG (Working name)
- EASTBOURNE AREA EPILEPSY GROUP (Previous name)
- EASTBOURNE EPILEPSY GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Shrieves | Chair | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Holder | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Simon Ethell | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie Ann Shrieves | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE SHRIEVES | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.51k | £2.28k | £3.93k | £5.76k | £4.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.12k | £2.08k | £2.35k | £1.45k | £4.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2015 AS AMENDED ON 26 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE EASTBOURNE AREA WHO SUFFER FROM EPILEPSY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEIR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF OUTINGS, MEETINGS AND OTHER SOCIAL GATHERINGS, WITH THE OBJECT OF PROVIDING THEM WITH MORE CONFIDENCE AND SOME RESPITE FROM THEIR CONDITION. (2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY RAISING AWARENESS AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES, SYMPTOMS AND TREATMENT OF EPILEPSY SO THAT THEY MAY BETTER ASSIST SUFFERERS.
Area of benefit
THE EASTBOURNE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 Greenway
EASTBOURNE
BN20 8UL
- Phone:
- 07497822055
- Email:
- EpilepsySussex@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window