Accounts and annual returns STAFFORD & RURAL HOMES LIMITED

Charity Number: 1112582
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 September 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 30 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 11 January 2016 On Time