Financial history STAFFORD & RURAL HOMES LIMITED

Charity Number: 1112582
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £26.21m £27.55m £28.55m £32.79m £32.96m
Total expenditure £18.02m £18.16m £20.59m £22.93m £25.06m
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 £109.00k £795.00k £0
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £25.90m £27.03m £28.06m £32.62m £31.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £301.00k £517.00k £490.00k £176.00k £1.34m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.00m £18.14m £20.59m £22.93m £25.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £14.15k £17.55k £26.68k £19.88k £21.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0