THE WANDA AND JANUSZ PRAWDZIC-SZLASKI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education particulary in the areas of Polish culture and society, of polish students by the provision of financial support as determined by the Trustees in their absolute discretion. To promote the undertaking of research into the area of polish culture. The relief of Polish people in the UK and throughout the world who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Poland
Governance
- 22 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANUSZ SIKORA-SIKORSKI KCSG | Chair |
|
||||||
Katarzyna Sikora-Sikorski | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.95k | £3.57k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.09k | £7.30k | £6.50k | £8.17k | £4.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
(3.1.1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION PARTICULARLY IN THE AREAS OF POLISH CULTURE AND SOCIETY, OF POLISH STUDENTS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION; (3.1.2) TO PROMOTE THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO THE AREA OF POLISH CULTURE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO STUDENTS UNDERTAKING SUCH RESEARCH AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES; (3.1.3) THE RELIEF OF POLISH PEOPLE IN THE UK AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
IN THE UK AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 HARWOOD AVENUE
BROMLEY
BR1 3DU
- Phone:
- 07710525672
- Email:
- janusz@sikorasikorski.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window