Redeemed Christian Church of God Breakthrough Church Bolton

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities, Relief of poverty, children/young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Bury
- Salford City
- Wigan
- Nigeria
Governance
- 02 November 2005: Standard registration
- RCCG - BREAKTHROUGH CHURCH (Working name)
- REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD BREAKTHROUGH CHURCH BOLTON (Working name)
- REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD BREAKTHROUGH CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR MUSA BAKO | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||
KAYODE IDOWU | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||
STEPHEN TAIWO OJO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.07k | £185.51k | £174.98k | £184.78k | £327.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.43k | £185.96k | £200.04k | £214.24k | £306.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2005 as amended on 14 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE: 2.2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE 2.2.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Hollins Drive
BOLTON
BL2 1DH
- Phone:
- 07903458803
- Email:
- pastoradeleye@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
rccgbreakthroughchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window