CERVICAL SPINE RESEARCH SOCIETY (EUROPEAN SECTION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of patients suffering from Cervical spine conditions arising from disease, malformation and accidents. The advancement through education, research and training in the field of cervical spine surgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 2006: Standard registration
- CSRS (ES) (Working name)
- CSRS EUROPEAN SECTION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN LEONARD | Chair | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDRES Combalia | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILIPPE BANCEL | Trustee | 23 February 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.63k | £33.73k | £159.87k | £69.32k | £142.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.01k | £51.90k | £170.25k | £90.86k | £145.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 28 JANUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM CERVICAL SPINE CONDITIONS ARISING FROM THE DISEASE, MALFORMATION AND OTHER CONDITIONS AFFECTING THE HUMAN CERVICAL SPINE IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE FIELD OF CERVICAL SPINE CONDITIONS AND THE PRACTICE OF CERVICAL SPINE SURGERY, AND 3.2 THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF ANY SUCH CERVICAL SPINE CONDITIONS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. EUROPE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LANGARD LIFFORD HALL
LIFFORD HALL
TUNNEL LANE
KINGS NORTON
BIRMINGHAM
B30 3JN
- Phone:
- 01214591222
- Email:
- info@liffordhall.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window