Financial history A SPOONFUL OF SUGAR

Charity number: 1111716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.44k £36 £122 £5.61k £1.55k
Total expenditure £11.74k £3.65k £293 £402 £239
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A