Accounts and annual returns AFGHAN ACTION

Charity number: 1111897
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 03 April 2025 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 28 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 15 March 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 March 2022 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required