Financial history COMMUNITY FOOD ENTERPRISE LIMITED

Charity number: 1116006
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £138.73k £86.33k £86.64k £129.82k £104.00k
Total expenditure £117.41k £83.21k £107.20k £88.53k £91.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £500 N/A N/A N/A